ND HB1072 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 61-04.1-04, section 61-04.1-06, and subdivision h of subsection 2 of section 61-04.1-16 of North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers and duties of the department of water resources; and to repeal section 61-04.1-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the required bond, cash, or negotiable securities required when bids are submitted to the atmospheric resources board.
Title
The required bond, cash, or negotiable securities required when bids are submitted to the atmospheric resources board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16 |
2023-03-17 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-13 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture and Veterans Affairs |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-01-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |