ND HB1063 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 61-02-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the term nonnavigable; and to repeal sections 61-15-01, 61-15-02, and 61-15-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to water conservation.
Title
Water conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2013-04-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2013-04-17 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Burckhard Unruh Triplett |
2013-04-11 | House | Conference committee appointed Schmidt Brabandt Mock |
2013-04-11 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |