ND HB1061 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the governor; and to amend and reenact sections 54-07-04 and 54-08-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salaries of the governor and lieutenant governor.
Title
The salaries of the governor and lieutenant governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 19 0 2 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |