ND HB1050 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
(Human Services Committee) A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of human services for the establishment of volunteer-based services; and to provide for reports to the legislative management.
Title
(Human Services Committee) A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of human services for the establishment of volunteer-based services; and to provide for reports to the legislative management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70 |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |