ND HB1037 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 15.1-21-02.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to North Dakota scholarship information; and to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15.1-06-06 and section 15.1-07-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the approval of public schools and the student information system.
Title
The approval of public schools and the student information system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Davison Schaible Vedaa |
2017-03-31 | House | Conference committee appointed Zubke Longmuir Guggisberg |
2017-03-31 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-03-30 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2017-01-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |