ND HB1032 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a mental health and substance abuse services pilot voucher payment program; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a mental health and substance abuse services pilot voucher payment program; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-13 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 74 | |
2011-01-12 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 0 | |
2011-01-10 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1032.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0232-02000.pdf |