ND HB1021 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of workforce safety and insurance.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of workforce safety and insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor 04/14 |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 7 |
2017-04-07 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5 |
2017-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 0 2 |
2017-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |