ND HB1019 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the parks and recreation department and the International Peace Garden; to provide for a transfer; to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 55-08-05 and section 55-08-14.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to recreational grants and concession agreements; to provide legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the parks and recreation department and the International Peace Garden; to provide for a transfer; to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 55-08-05 and section 55-08-14.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to recreational grants and concession agreements; to provide legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading passed, y 091 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Appointed Grindberg to replace Bowman | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Krebsbach Bowman Seymour | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Martinson Klein Williams | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-13 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-27 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-27 | Request return from committee | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 087 nays 005 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 024 n 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1019.html |