ND HB1016 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of job service North Dakota; and to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 52-02.1-01 and section 52-08-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the new jobs training program and workforce training program.
Title
The new jobs training program and workforce training program.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-20 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2011-04-20 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-19 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2011-04-19 | Conference committee appointed Grindberg Erbele Warner | |
2011-04-18 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 01:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from House | |
2011-02-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 | |
2011-01-11 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |