ND HB1006 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota aeronautics commission; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota aeronautics commission; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/05 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-18 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-15 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2011-04-14 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Grindberg O'Connell | |
2011-04-11 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-06 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-02 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from House | |
2011-02-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 | |
2011-02-18 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 1 1 | |
2011-01-31 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-10 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |