ND 4003 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 01/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution designating House and Senate employment positions and fixing compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution designating House and Senate employment positions and fixing compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 01/18
2021-01-18SenateSigned by President
2021-01-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-01-15SenateReturned to Senate
2021-01-14HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading
2021-01-13HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-13SenateSecond reading, adopted yeas 47 nays 0
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced, first reading

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback