ND HCR3058 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to commend and congratulate North Dakota's Alpha Company, 164th Engineer Combat Battalion, for being awarded the Army Valorous Unit Citation and to recognize and honor the unit and their family members for their heroic and selfless service, sacrifice, dedication, and contributions to North Dakota and the United States of America.
Title
A concurrent resolution to commend and congratulate North Dakota's Alpha Company, 164th Engineer Combat Battalion, for being awarded the Army Valorous Unit Citation and to recognize and honor the unit and their family members for their heroic and selfless service, sacrifice, dedication, and contributions to North Dakota and the United States of America.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08 |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned to House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced, first reading |