ND HCR3035 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution congratulating Cara Mund for being crowned Miss America 2018.
Title
A concurrent resolution congratulating Cara Mund for being crowned Miss America 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05 |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-27 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 84 nays 4 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |