ND HCR3032 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying methods of workforce expansion, enhancement, enlistment, and retention through educational programs and supports.
Title
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying methods of workforce expansion, enhancement, enlistment, and retention through educational programs and supports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 14 nays 76 |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |