ND 3029 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging federal authorities to observe and respect the principles of federalism and limits on federal power prescribed by the Constitution of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging federal authorities to observe and respect the principles of federalism and limits on federal power prescribed by the Constitution of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 04/14
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-06SenateSigned by President
2021-04-05HouseReturned to House
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, adopted
2021-03-26SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-26SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-02-22HouseReported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0
2021-02-18HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback