ND HCR3020 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution declaring the state will obey only the federal laws, agency rules, or presidential executive orders the state determines to be constitutional.
Title
A concurrent resolution declaring the state will obey only the federal laws, agency rules, or presidential executive orders the state determines to be constitutional.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] |
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 46 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20 |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-03-03 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 46 nays 45 |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |