ND HCR3015 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of implementing a community health worker program, including recommendations regarding a definition of a community health worker, the scope of work of a community health worker, the infrastructure for training of community health workers, the development of a community health worker certification process and related training curriculum and continuing education requirements, a strategy for community health worker services being Medicaid-reimbursed services, and private insurers' use of community health workers.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of implementing a community health worker program, including recommendations regarding a definition of a community health worker, the scope of work of a community health worker, the infrastructure for training of community health workers, the development of a community health worker certification process and related training curriculum and continuing education requirements, a strategy for community health worker services being Medicaid-reimbursed services, and private insurers' use of community health workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. Ruth Buffalo [D] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2 |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |