ND 3010 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 4 of article XIV of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to removing a provision that negates other provisions in the Constitution of North Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing a provision that negates other provisions in the Constitution of North Dakota.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 20 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 27
2021-03-26SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0
2021-03-26SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-03-04SenateReceived from House
2021-03-03HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 80 nays 11
2021-02-22HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0
2021-02-19HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback