ND HCR3006 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution calling for a convention for the purpose of amending the United States Constitution to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.
Title
A concurrent resolution calling for a convention for the purpose of amending the United States Constitution to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29 |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-17 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 69 nays 18 |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |