ND HCR3004 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 18 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 18 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section? 2 of article? V, section? 3 of article? IX, and sections? 12, 25, and? 26 of article? X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to the state treasurer; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The state treasurer; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 18 nays 68 |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |