ND HCR3001 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Budget Section) A concurrent resolution authorizing the Budget Section of the Legislative Management to hold the required legislative hearings on state plans for the receipt and expenditure of new or revised block grants passed by Congress.
Title
(Budget Section) A concurrent resolution authorizing the Budget Section of the Legislative Management to hold the required legislative hearings on state plans for the receipt and expenditure of new or revised block grants passed by Congress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/11 |
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-08 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-01-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |