ND SB2346 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 60-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of agriculture commissioner; to amend and reenact section 49-02-01, subsection 1 of section 60-02-01, sections 60-02-02, 60-02-03, 60-02-04, 60-02-05.1, 60-02-07, 60-02-07.2, 60-02-09, 60-02-09.1, 60-02-10.1, 60-02-11, 60-02-14, 60-02-17, 60-02-24, 60-02-27, 60-02-35.1, 60-02-38, 60-02-40, 60-02-41, and 60-02-42, subsection 1 of section 60-02.1-01, sections 60-02.1-02, 60-02.1-03, 60-02.1-04, 60-02.1-06, 60-02.1-07, 60-02.1-07.1, 60-02.1-08, 60-02.1-09, 60-02.1-11, 60-02.1-16, 60-02.1-17, 60-02.1-19, 60-02.1-22, 60-02.1-26, 60-02.1-27, 60-02.1-29, 60-02.1-30, 60-02.1-32, 60-02.1-33, 60-02.1-34, 60-02.1-35, 60-02.1-36, 60-02.1-37, 60-02.1-38, and 60-02.1-39, subsection 1 of section 60-04-01, and sections 60-04-03, 60-04-03.1, 60-04-03.2, 60-04-03.3, 60-04-04, 60-04-05, 60-04-06, 60-04-07, 60-04-08, 60-04-09, 60-04-10, 60-05-01, 60-05-02, 60-05-03, 60-05-04, 60-06-05, 60-06-06.1, 60-10-01, 60-10-02, 60-10-03, 60-10-05, 60-10-07, 60-10-08, 60-10-09, 60-10-10, 60-10-11, 60-10-12, 60-10-14, and 60-10-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to moving the authority over grain, grain buyers, warehousing, deposits, and warehousemen from the public service commission to the agriculture commissioner; to provide a penalty; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Moving the authority over grain, grain buyers, warehousing, deposits, and warehousemen from the public service commission to the agriculture commissioner; to provide a penalty; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed D. Johnson Satrom Headland |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Klein Myrdal Hogan |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 13 |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 10:40 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |