ND 2344 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 19-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical marijuana; to amend and reenact section 54-60-03, paragraph 3 of subdivision a of subsection 15 of section 57-02-08, and paragraph 2 of subdivision b of subsection 15 of section 57-02-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to primary sector business certification and property tax exemptions for farm buildings and residences; to repeal chapter 19-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical marijuana; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateSigned by Governor 04/17
2017-04-14SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-14SenateSigned by President
2017-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 9, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-13SenateConcurred
2017-04-04SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-04HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 79 nays 13
2017-04-04HouseAmendment adopted
2017-04-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2017-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-22SenateAmendment failed
2017-02-22SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2017-02-21SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 5 1
2017-02-21SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-02-20SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-02-20SenateAmendment adopted
2017-02-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2017-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-01-27SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback