ND SB2329 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-01-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of an authorized emergency vehicle.
Title
The definition of an authorized emergency vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-03-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 4 |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |