ND SB2315 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 32-12.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to liability of political subdivisions.
Title
Liability of political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] |
Rep. Gary Paur [R] | Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/25 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2015-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |