ND 2297 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial dog breeders; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial dog breeders; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-10SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 31
2017-02-09SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-25SenateRereferred to Agriculture
2017-01-25SenateRequest return from committee
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback