ND SB2263 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 61-32-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to subsurface water management system permits.
Title
Subsurface water management system permits.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 2 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 87 |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |