ND SB2262 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-40.6-01 and 57-40.6-08, subdivision
Title
Fees for 911 services; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 27 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba2262.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0448-01000.pdf |