ND SB2240 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 1 of section 15.1-09-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exception to notice and bidding requirements.
Title
An exception to notice and bidding requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |