ND SB2234 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-11-30 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the boundaries of property the state board of higher education may sell to fraternal societies.
Title
The boundaries of property the state board of higher education may sell to fraternal societies.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |