ND 2223 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-39.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for clothing; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A sales and use tax exemption for clothing; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-16SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 27
2015-02-16SenateAmendment failed
2015-02-16SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2015-02-11SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-10SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0
2015-01-28SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback