ND 2218 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 54-03-02.2 and a new section to chapter 54-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to introduction of bills and interim committees; to amend and reenact section 54-03-02, subsection 1 of section 54-03-20, subsection 2 of section 54-03.2-14, subsection 3 of section 54-35-02.4, sections 54-35-02.7 and 54-35-16, subsection 1 of section 54-35-22, and sections 54-35-26 and 54-44.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to annually reconvened sessions of the legislative assembly and interim committee meetings; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annually reconvened sessions of the legislative assembly and interim committee meetings; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 28 nays 19
2021-02-22SenateAmendment adopted
2021-02-22SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-02-22SenateReconsidered
2021-02-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 24* nays 23 *President cast deciding vote
2021-02-17SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-04SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-04SenateReported back, do pass 7 0 0
2021-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback