ND 2198 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-62-01, 43-62-02, 43-62-03, 43-62-04, 43-62-08, 43-62-09, 43-62-11, 43-62-14, 43-62-15, and 43-62-18, and subsections? 7 and 13 of section 43-62-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of medical imaging and radiation therapy; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The regulation of medical imaging and radiation therapy; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateSigned by Governor 03/15
2017-03-14SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-13SenateSigned by President
2017-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-13SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-03-08HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 2 2
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-24SenateCommittee Hearing 10:45
2017-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback