ND 2185 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-02-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a property tax exemption for domestic violence shelters; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A property tax exemption for domestic violence shelters; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
2021-01-27SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback