ND SB2184 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-01 and a new section to chapter 23-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to phlebotomists and notification protocol in the case of exposure to an infectious organism; to amend and reenact sections 23-09.3-04 and 23-17.3-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notification protocol in the case of exposure to an infectious organism; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Notification protocol in the case of exposure to an infectious organism; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |