ND 2169 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Signed by Governor 03/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 28-20.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to recognition of foreign-country money judgments; and to repeal chapter 28-20.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to foreign money judgments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreign money judgments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31SenateSigned by Governor 03/30
2017-03-29SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-28SenateSigned by President
2017-03-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-27SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 6
2017-03-22HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 1
2017-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-16SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback