ND SB2166 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 12.1-23-05 and 12.1-23-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to theft offenses; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Theft offenses; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] |
Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Paul Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-18 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-18 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 63 nays 30 |
2021-03-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |