ND 2149 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 47-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a prohibition on private transfer fee obligations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A prohibition on private transfer fee obligations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-26 Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
2011-04-25 Signed by Governor 04/25
2011-04-22 Signed by President
2011-03-22 Signed by Speaker
2011-03-21 Returned to Senate
2011-03-18 Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2011-03-16 Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2011-03-15 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-02-23 Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2011-01-24 Received from Senate
2011-01-21 Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2011-01-20 Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2011-01-18 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-01-06 Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback