ND SB2144 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 4.1-06-03 and 4.1-06-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to elections of members to the North Dakota dry bean council.
Title
Elections of members to the North Dakota dry bean council.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Rep. Tracy Boe [D] |
Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |