ND 2133 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 57-60-01, subsection 1 of section 57-60-02, and section 57-60-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the coal conversion facilities privilege tax; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The coal conversion facilities privilege tax; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2017-03-14SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-13SenateSigned by President
2017-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-10SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-27SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-26SenateRequest return from committee
2017-01-24SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-01-24SenateReported back, do pass 6 0 0
2017-01-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback