ND SB2119 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 23-09-16.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to food and lodging establishment license renewals; and to amend and reenact sections 23-09-16 and 23-09-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to food and lodging establishment licenses.
Title
Food and lodging establishment licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 3 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |