ND SB2118 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 50-06-21 and 50-06-22 and subsection 4 of section 53-12.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gambling disorder prevention, awareness, crisis intervention, rehabilitation, and treatment services.
Title
Gambling disorder prevention, awareness, crisis intervention, rehabilitation, and treatment services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 15 |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |