ND 2100 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 84
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of virtual currency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of virtual currency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 84
2017-02-23HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-14HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-01-13HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-01-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-11SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-04SenateCommittee Hearing 11:15
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback