ND SB2097 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 39-06.2-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statutory fees and moving violations; to amend and reenact subsection 78 of section 39-01-01, subsection 6 of section 39-06.1-06, and sections 39-06.1-09, 39-12-22, and 39-32-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statutory fees and moving violations; to repeal sections 8-02-08, 39-06.2-17, 39-12-24, and 39-12-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transportation standards, exemptions, citations, excess size and weight restrictions, and funding for an electronic permit system; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Transportation standards, exemptions, citations, excess size and weight restrictions, and funding for an electronic permit system; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/25 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2021-03-16 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-01-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |