ND SB2081 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 61-16.2-06 and 61-16.2-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permissible uses in the floodway and flood fringe under the national flood insurance program.
Title
Permissible uses in the floodway and flood fringe under the national flood insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |