ND SB2024 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the comprehensive tobacco control advisory committee; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the comprehensive tobacco control advisory committee; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 68 nays 23 |
2013-04-26 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider failed |
2013-04-25 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 47 nays 46 |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed J. Nelson Pollert Holman |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Kilzer Grindberg Mathern |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 56 nays 37 |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 7 1 |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |