ND HB1527 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 4.1-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to oversight of the milk marketing board by the agriculture commissioner and milk retail prices; and to amend and reenact sections 4.1-26-10, 4.1-26-11, and 4.1-26-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to milk retail prices.
Title
Milk retail prices.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Marschall [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] |
Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 21 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 71 |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |