ND 1471 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapters 15-10 and 15.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to freedom of expression rights of students of public institutions of higher education and public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freedom of expression rights of students of public institutions of higher education and public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-10HouseSigned by Governor 04/09
2015-04-08HouseSent to Governor
2015-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-04-07SenateSigned by President
2015-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0
2015-04-06HouseConcurred
2015-03-27HouseReturned to House (12)
2015-03-26SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2015-03-25SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-03-25SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2015-03-18SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2015-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2015-02-23SenateReceived from House
2015-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2015-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0
2015-02-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-01-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback