ND HB1466 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 10-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to North Dakota public benefit corporations; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Title
North Dakota public benefit corporations; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 27 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |