ND HB1440 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 65-05-09.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation additional benefits payable.
Title
Workers' compensation additional benefits payable.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Boe [D] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Scot Kelsh [D] | Rep. Phillip Mueller [D] |
Sen. David O'Connell [D] | Rep. Steve Zaiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 66 | |
2011-02-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 | |
2011-01-26 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |